MS SC633 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Mourning The Loss And Commending The Professional And Civic Service Of Real Estate Pioneer Lavaree "johnetta" Jones Of Jackson, Mississippi.
Title
Commend the life and civic leadership of real estate pioneer Lavaree Jones of Jackson, Mississippi.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-28 - House - House Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-28 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2014-03-28 | House | Immediate Release |
2014-03-28 | House | Adopted |
2014-03-28 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-03-27 | House | Referred To Rules |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Adopted |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Referred To Rules |