MS SC632 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing The Educational Leadership Of Hinds County Superintendent Of Education Dr. Stephen Lewis Handley Upon The Occasion Of His Retirement.
Title
Recognize Dr. Stephen L. Handley upon retirement as Hinds County Superintendent of Education.
Sponsors
Sen. David Blount [D] | Sen. Albert Butler [D] | Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] | Sen. Lydia Chassaniol [R] |
Sen. Joey Fillingane [R] | Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-28 - House - House Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-28 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2014-03-28 | House | Immediate Release |
2014-03-28 | House | Adopted |
2014-03-28 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-03-27 | House | Referred To Rules |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Adopted |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Referred To Rules |