MS SC631 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Simpson County Academy "cougars" High School Boys Basketball Team And Coach James Crain For Winning The 2013-2014 Mais Class Aa State Championship.
Title
Commend Simpson County Academy "Cougars" High School Boys Basketball Team for Class AA State Championship.
Sponsors
Sen. Perry Lee [R] | Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] | Sen. Lydia Chassaniol [R] | Sen. Joey Fillingane [R] |
Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-28 - House - House Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-28 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2014-03-28 | House | Immediate Release |
2014-03-28 | House | Adopted |
2014-03-28 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-03-27 | House | Referred To Rules |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Adopted |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Referred To Rules |