MS SC630 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing And Congratulating Greenwood Historian And Historic Preservationist Mary Carol Miller For Receiving Two National Awards By The Daughters Of The American Revolution.
Title
Recognize Greenwood Historian and Preservationist Mary Carol Miller for receiving two National Awards by the D.A.R.
Sponsors
Sen. Lydia Chassaniol [R] | Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] | Sen. Joey Fillingane [R] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-28 - House - House Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-28 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2014-03-28 | House | Immediate Release |
2014-03-28 | House | Adopted |
2014-03-28 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-03-27 | House | Referred To Rules |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Adopted |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Referred To Rules |