MS SC624 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating Picayune Memorial High School's High Tide Productions For Receiving The Award For Best Production At The 2014 Mississippi Theatre Association State Competition.
Title
Commend Picayune High School High Tide Productions for receiving Best Production Award at 2014 State Theatre Competition.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Smith [R] | Sen. Angela Burks Hill [R] | Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] |
Sen. Perry Lee [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-28 - House - House Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-28 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2014-03-28 | House | Immediate Release |
2014-03-28 | House | Adopted |
2014-03-27 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-03-27 | House | Referred To Rules |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Adopted |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Rules |