MS SC616 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing September 2014 As "pain Awareness Month In Mississippi" To Bring Awareness For People In Pain.
Title
Recognizing September 2014 as "Pain Awareness Month in Mississippi."
Sponsors
Sen. Terry Burton [R] | Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] | Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] | Sen. Sollie Norwood [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-25 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-25 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2014-03-25 | House | Immediate Release |
2014-03-25 | House | Adopted |
2014-03-24 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-03-21 | House | Referred To Rules |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Adopted |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Referred To Rules |