MS SC614 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing The Record Of Achievement And Legacy Of Service Of H. Lee Hedegaard Upon The Occasion Of His Retirement As General Manager And Ceo Of Singing River Electric Power Association.
Title
Recognize record and legacy of H. Lee Hedegaard on his retirement as General Manager and CEO of Singing River EPA.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-21 - House - House Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-21 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2014-03-21 | House | Immediate Release |
2014-03-21 | House | Adopted |
2014-03-20 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-03-19 | House | Referred To Rules |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Adopted |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Referred To Rules |