MS SC592 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution To Commend And Congratulate The Pearl River Resort Corporate Weight Loss Challenge Program Which Has Received National Media Recognition As It Expands Into A Weight Loss Movement For The Entire Choctaw Community.
Title
Commend the award-winning Pearl River Resort corporate weight-loss challenge program inspiring the entire Choctaw community.
Sponsors
Sen. Giles Ward [R] | Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] | Sen. Lydia Chassaniol [R] | Sen. Joey Fillingane [R] |
Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-14 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-14 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2014-03-14 | House | Immediate Release |
2014-03-14 | House | Adopted |
2014-03-13 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-03-10 | House | Referred To Rules |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Adopted |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Referred To Rules |