MS SC589 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution To Commemorate The 50th Anniversary Of The Freedom Summer Of 1964 Civil Rights Movement In Mississippi, To Recognize The Social Contributions Of These Volunteers And To Welcome The "mississippi Freedom Summer 50th Anniversary Conference" To Our State.
Title
Commemorate the 50th Anniversary of the Freedom Summer of 1964 Civil Rights Movement in Mississippi and recognize volunteers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-18 - House - House Adopted (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-18 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2014-03-18 | House | Immediate Release |
2014-03-18 | House | Adopted |
2014-03-17 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-03-04 | House | Referred To Rules |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Adopted |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Referred To Rules |