MS SC587 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on March 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on March 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing The Lifetime Achievement And Public Service Of Charlie Horhn, Longtime District Director For United States Congressman Bennie G. Thompson.
Title
Recognize lifetime achievement and public service of Charlie Horhn, longtime District Director for Congressman Bennie Thompson.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-14 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-14 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2014-03-14 | House | Immediate Release |
2014-03-14 | House | Adopted |
2014-03-13 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-03-10 | House | Referred To Rules |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Adopted |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Referred To Rules |