MS SC563 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on February 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on February 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing The Historical Significance Of Coleman High School In Greenville, Mississippi, And Commending The Preservation Efforts Of The Greenville Progressive Art And Civic Club On The Occasion Of "lizzie W. Coleman Day."
Title
Recognize historical significance of Coleman High School and commend Greenville Progressive Art and Civic Club.
Sponsors
Sen. Derrick Simmons [D] | Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] | Sen. Eugene Clarke [R] | Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] |
Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] | Sen. David Jordan [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-02-20 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2014-02-20 | House | Immediate Release |
2014-02-20 | House | Adopted |
2014-02-18 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred To Rules |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Adopted |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Referred To Rules |