MS SC552 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-11 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-11 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing And Saluting The Military And Public Service Of Mississippi Air National Guard Chief Master Sergeant Jerome Jackson Of Preston, Mississippi, On The Occasion Of His Retirement.
Title
Recognize and salute the military and public service of Mississippi Air National Guard Chief Master Sergeant Jerome Jackson.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-05 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-02-05 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2014-02-05 | House | Immediate Release |
2014-02-05 | House | Adopted |
2014-01-31 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-01-30 | House | Referred To Rules |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Adopted |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Referred To Rules |