MS SC508 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-11 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-11 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Paying Tribute To The Memory Of Gene Triggs, Sr., Of Clinton, A Business, Civic, University, Political And Church Leader In Mississippi For Four Decades.
Title
Pay tribute to the memory of Mississippi civic leader Gene Triggs, Sr.
Sponsors
Sen. David Blount [D] | Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] | Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] | Sen. Derrick Simmons [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-27 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-01-27 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2014-01-27 | House | Immediate Release |
2014-01-27 | House | Adopted |
2014-01-16 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-01-15 | House | Referred To Rules |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Adopted |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Referred To Rules |