MS SC507 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on February 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-11 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on February 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-11 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Mourning The Loss And Commending The Public Service Of Dr. Donald A. Cabana, Former Warden And Superintendent Of The Mississippi State Penitentiary.
Title
Mourn the loss and commend the public service of Dr. Don Cabana, former Warden of the Mississippi State Penitentiary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-27 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-01-27 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2014-01-27 | House | Immediate Release |
2014-01-27 | House | Adopted |
2014-01-16 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-01-15 | House | Referred To Rules |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Adopted |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Referred To Rules |