MS SB2954 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 813, Local And Private Laws Of 1989, As Last Amended By Chapter 956, Local And Private Laws Of 2011, To Extend From September 30, 2014, To September 30, 2017, The Date Of Repeal On The Provision Of Law That Establishes The Greenwood Tourism Commission And Authorizes The City Of Greenwood To Impose A Tax On Hotels, Motels And Restaurants; To Require An Election On The Continuation Of The Tax If A Certain Number Of Electors File A Written Protest Against The Continuation Of The Tax; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Greenwood; extend the repeal date on the Greenwood Tourism Commission.
Sponsors
Sen. David Jordan [D] | Sen. Lydia Chassaniol [R] | Sen. David Parker [R] | Sen. Chris Massey [R] |
Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-19 - House - House Passed (Y: 107 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-28 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-03-24 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-19 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2014-03-19 | House | Immediate Release |
2014-03-19 | House | Passed |
2014-03-14 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-03-13 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Amended |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-02-27 | Senate | DR - TSDP: LP To FI |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private;Finance |