MS SB2936 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-20 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-20 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-65-101, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Aircraft Used Predominately To Transport Passengers Or Property To Offshore Oil Or Natural Gas Exploration Or Production Platforms Or Vessels, And Engines, Accessories And Spare Parts For Such Aircraft, Are Exempt From Sales Taxation; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Sales taxation; sales of aircraft used in oil or natural gas exploration or production are exempt.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | House | Died On Calendar |
2014-03-18 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Smith (39th), Rogers (61st)) |
2014-03-18 | House | Passed |
2014-03-18 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Passed |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Referred To Finance |