MS SB2633 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Enact The "mississippi Student Religious Liberties Act Of 2013"; To Provide For Voluntary Student Expression Of Religious Viewpoints In Public Schools; To Provide That Public School Districts Shall Allow Religious Expression In Class Assignments; To Provide That Public School Districts Shall Provide Students With The Freedom To Organize Religious Groups And Activities; To Provide That Public School Districts Shall Provide A Limited Public Forum For Student Speakers At Nongraduation And Graduation Events; To Provide A Model Policy For Voluntary Religious Expression In Public Schools; And For Related Purposes.
Title
"Mississippi Student Religious Liberties Act of 2013"; enact.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 109 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-07 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-03-06 | House | Passed |
2013-03-05 | House | Read the Third Time |
2013-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred To Education |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Passed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Education |