MS SB2622 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-11 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-11 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Provide For Contractor Liens And The Enforcement And Notice Of Contractor Liens; To Create New Section 85-7-401, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Define Certain Terms; To Create New Section 85-7-403, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For Liens For Labor, Services Or Materials Furnished; To Create New Section 85-7-405, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide How The Liens Are Created And Recorded; To Create New Section 85-7-407, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Contractors To List All Subcontractors, Materialmen, Laborers And Employees; To Create New Section 85-7-409, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Limit The Recovery Of Subcontractors Against A Residential Homeowner Under Certain Circumstances; To Create New Section 85-7-411, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For The Attachment Of Liens To Buildings Or Improvements On Leased Land; To Create New Section 85-7-413, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For The Dissolving Of Liens; To Create New Section 85-7-415, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For The Discharge Of A Lien By Filing Bond; To Create New Section 85-7-417, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For The Rights Of Certain Professionals; To Create New Section 85-7-419, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For The Waiver And Release Of Lien And Bond Rights; To Create New Section 85-7-421, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For Extinguishment Of Liens If No Notice Of Commencement Is Filed; To Create New Section 85-7-423, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide A Time Limitation On Commencing Lien Actions; To Provide For Notice Of Contest Of A Lien; To Create New Section 85-7-425, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For The Computation Of Time; To Create New Sections 85-7-427 And 85-7-429, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Address The Priority Of Liens; To Create New Section 85-7-431, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For The Enforcement Of Judgments; To Create New Section 85-7-433, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide A Penalty For Filing A False Lien; To Amend Sections 85-7-131, 85-7-133,, 85-7-141, 85-7-143, 85-7-145 And 85-7-147, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; To Repeal Sections 85-7-135, 85-7-137, 85-7-139, 85-7-149, 85-7-151, 85-7-181, 85-7-183, 85-7-185, 85-7-197, 85-7-199 And 85-7-201, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provide For Liens On Amounts Due A Contractor And The Recording Thereof; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Contractor's liens; revise stop notice law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-21 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-11 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-03-28 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2014-03-21 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2014-03-20 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2014-03-19 | House | Conferees Named Baker,Lamar,Powell |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Doty,Horhn |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2014-03-04 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2014-02-28 | House | Passed As Amended |
2014-02-28 | House | Amended |
2014-02-28 | House | Reconsidered |
2014-02-28 | House | Motion to Recnsdr Tabled Lost |
2014-02-27 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Zuber, Baker, Reynolds) |
2014-02-27 | House | Passed |
2014-02-27 | House | Amendment Failed |
2014-02-24 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-02-18 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Amended |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |