MS SB2425 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-6)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-6)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-65-111, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Exempt From Sales Taxation Retail Sales Of Firearms, Ammunition And Hunting Supplies When Sold During The Annual Mississippi Second Amendment Weekend Holiday Beginning At 12:01 A.m. On The First Friday In September And Ending At 12:00 Midnight On The Following Sunday; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Sales tax; exempt sales of firearms, ammunition and hunting supplies during Mississippi Sportsman Weekend.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 39 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 102 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 42 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 102 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 42 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2014-03-19 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2014-03-18 | House | Passed As Amended |
2014-03-18 | House | Amended |
2014-03-18 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Passed |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Amendment Failed |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2014-02-20 | Senate | DR - TSDPCS: FI To WI |
2014-01-30 | Senate | DR - TSDP: WI To FI |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Referred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks;Finance |