MS SB2357 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 35-7-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Veterans' Home Purchase Board To Designate One Of Its Employees To Be Authorized To Sign The Deed Of Conveyance Or Other Closing Documents Necessary As To Not Delay The Closing Or Settlement Of A Home Purchase During The Absence Or Unavailability Of The Director; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Veterans' Home Purchase Board; authorize to designate employee to sign closing documents during absence of the director.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-14 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-05 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed |
2014-02-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-02-25 | House | DR - TSDP: BB To MA |
2014-02-25 | House | DR - TSDP: MA To BB |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred To Military Affairs;Banking and Financial Services |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Passed |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Veterans and Military Affairs |