MS HB585 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-03-31 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Sections 9-23-3, 9-23-5, 9-23-9, 9-23-11, 9-23-13, 9-23-15, 9-23-17 And 9-23-19, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Drug Court Provisions Regarding Legislative Intent, Definitions, The Advisory Committee, Intervention Components And Services, Participation, Authority And Funding; To Amend Section 99-15-26, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Nonadjudicated Probation; To Amend Section 47-7-33, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Probation; To Amend Sections 47-5-1003 And 47-5-1007, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Intensive Supervision And Electronic Home Detention; To Amend Section 99-15-107, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Eligibility For The Pretrial Intervention Program; To Amend Sections 97-17-39, 97-17-41, 97-17-42, 97-17-43, 97-17-47, 97-17-62, 97-17-64, 97-17-67, 97-17-70, 97-17-71, 97-21-29, 97-21-33, 97-21-37, 97-21-59, 97-23-19, 97-23-93, 97-23-94, 97-45-3, 97-45-5, 97-45-7 And 97-45-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Threshold Monetary Amount Regarding Property And Certain Other Crimes That Designates Such Crimes As Misdemeanors And Felonies And To Revise Certain Penalties; To Bring Forward Section 97-45-19, Mississippi Code Of 1972; To Create Section 97-43-3.1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That It Shall Be Unlawful For Any Person To Conduct An Organized Theft Or Fraud Enterprise; To Amend Sections 41-29-139 And 41-29-313, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Penalties Related To Certain Controlled Substances; To Create Section 97-3-2, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Define Crimes Of Violence; To Amend Section 47-7-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Parole Eligibility; To Amend Section 47-5-138.1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Exceptions For Eligibility For Trusty Time; To Provide For Inmate Case Planning; To Provide Parole Release Procedures; To Amend Sections 47-7-17 And 47-5-157, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity; To Amend Section 47-7-2, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Define Certain Terms; To Provide For Reentry Planning For Inmates; To Amend Sections 45-33-41, 47-5-173 And 47-5-177, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Victim Notification Provisions; To Amend Sections 47-7-5 And 47-7-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Training Requirements; To Provide For Graduated Sanctions And Incentives; To Provide For Earned Discharge; To Amend Sections 47-7-27, 47-7-34, 47-7-37, 47-5-901 And 47-5-911, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Parole Violation Hearings Provisions; To Establish Technical Violation Centers In The Department Of Corrections; To Amend Sections 47-5-10 And 47-5-26, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity; To Amend Section 47-5-28, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Duties And Responsibilities Of The Commissioner Of The Department Of Corrections; To Require County Clerks, Municipal Clerks And Justice Court Clerks To File Certain Information With The Mississippi Judicial College; To Provide For Fiscal Impact Notes; To Create The Sentencing And Criminal Justice Oversight Task Force; To Provide For The Membership, Duties And Powers Of The Task Force; To Make A Statement Of Legislative Intent And Purpose To Provide Veterans Treatment Courts; To Authorize Creation Of A Veterans Treatment Court Program By The Circuit Courts; To Provide Conditions For Eligibility For Participation In A Program; To Task The Administrative Office Of Courts With Supervisory Responsibility; To Require The State Drug Court Advisory Committee With The Responsibility To Develop Statewide Rules And Policies For Veterans Treatment Courts; To Create The Veterans Treatment Courts Funds; To Provide For Immunity Of The Staff Members Of Veterans Treatment Courts For Their Good-faith Acts; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes & sentencing; enact certain reforms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-20 - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 105 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 105 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House Passed As Amended (Y: 114 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House Passed As Amended (Y: 106 N: 7 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-31 Approved by Governor
2014-03-25SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2014-03-25HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2014-03-20SenateConference Report Adopted
2014-03-20HouseConference Report Adopted
2014-03-19HouseConference Report Filed
2014-03-19SenateConference Report Filed
2014-03-19SenateRecommitted For Further Conf
2014-03-19SenateReconsidered
2014-03-19HouseRecommitted For Further Conf
2014-03-19HouseReconsidered
2014-03-18SenateMotion to Reconsider Entered
2014-03-17SenateConference Report Adopted
2014-03-17HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (Malone, Gipson, Campbell, Taylor)
2014-03-17HouseConference Report Adopted
2014-03-13SenateConference Report Filed
2014-03-13HouseConference Report Filed
2014-03-12SenateConferees Named Jackson (32nd),Wiggins,Tindell
2014-03-12HouseConferees Named Gipson,Dixon,Taylor
2014-03-11HouseDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2014-03-07SenateReturned For Concurrence
2014-03-06SenatePassed As Amended
2014-03-06SenateAmended
2014-03-03SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2014-02-21SenateReferred To Corrections
2014-02-17HouseTransmitted To Senate
2014-02-13HouseImmediate Release
2014-02-13HousePassed As Amended
2014-02-13HouseAmended
2014-02-13HouseReconsidered
2014-02-11HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (Baker, Gipson, Campbell)
2014-02-10HousePassed As Amended
2014-02-10HouseAmended
2014-02-10HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2014-01-30HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2014-01-30HouseDR - TSDPCS: CN To JB
2014-01-30HouseDR - TSDPCS: JB To CN
2014-01-20HouseReferred To Judiciary B;Corrections

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2014/pdf/history/HB/HB0585.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2014/html/HB/0500-0599/HB0585IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2014/html/HB/0500-0599/HB0585CS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2014/html/HB/0500-0599/HB0585PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2014/html/HB/0500-0599/HB0585SG.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2014/pdf/votes/house/0350003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2014/pdf/votes/house/0380024.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2014/pdf/votes/senate/0590016.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2014/pdf/votes/house/0700004.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2014/pdf/votes/senate/0700022.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2014/pdf/votes/house/0730002.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2014/pdf/votes/senate/0730010.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback