MS HB1591 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-19 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-19 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize An Income And/or Franchise Tax Credit Equal To A Certain Amount Of The Cost Of Purchasing And Installing Solar Energy Systems And Energy Efficiency Services; To Provide That The Credit Shall Apply To All Solar Energy Systems Installed Or Energy Efficiency Services Purchases On Or After July 1, 2013; To Provide The Manner In Which The Credit May Be Claimed; To Provide That If The Amount Of Credit Claimed By A Taxpayer Exceeds The Amount Of Income And/or Franchise Tax Imposed Upon The Taxpayer For The Taxable Year, Then The Taxpayer Shall Receive A Refund From The Department Of Revenue For The Amount Of Such Excess; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Income and franchise tax; allow refundable credit for costs of purchasing and installing solar energy system or energy efficiency services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-19 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2013-02-27 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-02-26 | House | Passed |
2013-02-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-02-01 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |