MS HB141 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Prohibit A County, Board Of Supervisors Of A County, Municipality Or Governing Authority Of A Municipality From Establishing A Mandatory, Minimum Living Wage Rate, Minimum Number Of Vacation Or Sick Days, That Would Regulate How A Private Employer Pays Its Employees; To Provide That The Legislature Finds That These Prohibitions Are Necessary To Ensure An Economic Climate Conducive To New Business Development And Job Growth In The State Of Mississippi; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Counties and municipalities; prohibit from establishing mandatory minimum wage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 76 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 66 N: 49 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 76 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 66 N: 49 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-18 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Passed |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2013-02-20 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-02-18 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2013-02-15 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Evans (70th), Bell) |
2013-02-15 | House | Passed As Amended |
2013-02-15 | House | Amended |
2013-02-15 | House | Reconsidered |
2013-02-12 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Evans (70th), Bell) |
2013-02-12 | House | Passed |
2013-01-31 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-01-11 | House | Referred To Workforce Development |