MO SJR36 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 7 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 7 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies constitutional provisions regarding the right to keep and bear arms
Title
Modifies constitutional provisions regarding the right to keep and bear arms
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2014-05-07 | House | S Third Read and Passed |
2014-05-07 | House | S concurs in HA 1 |
2014-05-06 | House | H Third Read and Passed, as amended |
2014-05-06 | House | HA 1 H offered & adopted (Diehl)--(4598S02.02H) |
2014-04-23 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2014-04-23 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2014-04-17 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2014-04-17 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-17 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-10 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2014-04-10 | House | Reported Do Pass H General Laws Committee |
2014-04-10 | House | Voted Do Pass H General Laws Committee |
2014-04-01 | House | Hearing Conducted H General Laws Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred H General Laws Committee |
2014-02-24 | House | H Second Read |
2014-02-20 | House | H First Read |
2014-02-20 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Perfected |
2014-02-17 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2014-02-17 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S offered & defeated (Sifton)--(4598S02.01F) |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2014-02-13 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (4598S.02C) |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2014-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SJR 36-Schaefer and Richard |
2013-12-03 | Senate | Prefiled |