MO SJR25 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SJR 25-Lager, with SS, SA 2 & SA 1 to SA 2 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SJR 25-Lager, with SS, SA 2 & SA 1 to SA 2 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Grants the General Assembly the power to limit by statute jury awards of noneconomic damages
Title
Grants the General Assembly the power to limit by statute jury awards of noneconomic damages
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Lager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SJR 25-Lager, with SS, SA 2 & SA 1 to SA 2 (pending) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-04-09 | Senate | SA 1 to SA 2 to SS S offered (Lager)--(4582S03.16S) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | SA 2 to SS S offered (Lager)--(4582S03.12S) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S withdrawn |
2014-04-07 | Senate | SA 1 to SA 1 to SS S offered (Keaveny)--(4582S03.08S) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered (Lager)--(4582S03.02S) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | SS S offered (Lager)--(4582S.03F) |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Reported from S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee to Floor |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2014-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SJR 25-Lager |
2013-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=27723576 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/pdf-bill/intro/SJR25.pdf |