MO SJR22 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-19 - Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-19 - Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that a member of the General Assembly shall vacate his or her office if such member leaves the state during a legislative session for the purpose of avoiding any official duty or vote
Title
Provides that a member of the General Assembly shall vacate his or her office if such member leaves the state during a legislative session for the purpose of avoiding any official duty or vote
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Parson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-19 | Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee | |
2011-04-12 | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee | |
2011-02-28 | S First Read--SJR 22-Parson |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=4200916 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/pdf-bill/intro/SJR22.pdf |