MO SB869 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to children
Title
Modifies provisions relating to children
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2014-05-16 | House | S Third Read and Passed |
2014-05-16 | House | S concurs in HCS, as amended |
2014-05-15 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2014-05-15 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2014-05-15 | House | Bill Laid over |
2014-05-15 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Allen)--(5745H04.10H) |
2014-05-15 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Haefner)--(5745H04.08H) |
2014-05-15 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Lauer)--(5745H04.03H) |
2014-05-15 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Fitzpatrick)--(5745H04.18H) |
2014-05-15 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2014-05-15 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2014-05-14 | House | Executive Session - No Action Taken - H Fiscal Review Committee |
2014-05-13 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2014-05-12 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-05-12 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-05-07 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2014-05-07 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H General Laws Committee |
2014-05-06 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H General Laws Committee |
2014-05-05 | House | Hearing Conducted H General Laws Committee |
2014-04-30 | House | Hearing Cancelled H General Laws Committee |
2014-04-24 | House | Referred H General Laws Committee |
2014-04-22 | House | H Second Read |
2014-04-17 | House | H First Read |
2014-04-17 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Perfected |
2014-04-15 | Senate | SS S offered & adopted (Schmitt)--(5745S.03F) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Reported from S Seniors, Families and Pensions Committee to Floor |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Pensions Committee |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Pensions Committee |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Pensions Committee |
2014-02-13 | Senate | S First Read--SB 869-Schmitt |