MO SB830 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 830-Parson
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 830-Parson
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that defendants in tort actions shall only be held severally liable and not jointly
Title
Provides that defendants in tort actions shall only be held severally liable and not jointly
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Parson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 830-Parson |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Taken up for Perfection |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Reported from S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee to Floor |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2014-02-05 | Senate | S First Read--SB 830-Parson |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=29548977 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/pdf-bill/intro/SB830.pdf |