MO SB819 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 819-Wallingford, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 819-Wallingford, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts multiple provisions to protect the use of student data and teacher data
Title
Enacts multiple provisions to protect the use of student data and teacher data
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 819-Wallingford, with SCS |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2014-03-27 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee (5666S.04C) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2014-02-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 819-Wallingford |