MO SB815 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 815-Pearce, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 815-Pearce, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the duties of the State Board of Education and requires the board to promulgate rules regarding student data accessibility
Title
Modifies the duties of the State Board of Education and requires the board to promulgate rules regarding student data accessibility
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | S Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 815-Pearce, with SCS |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2014-04-16 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (5623S.06C) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Education Committee |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2014-02-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 815-Pearce |