MO SB814 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 814-Brown
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 814-Brown
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes the wood energy producers tax credit and caps the amount of tax credits available under the program each fiscal year
Title
Reauthorizes the wood energy producers tax credit and caps the amount of tax credits available under the program each fiscal year
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Brown [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 814-Brown |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-03-11 | Senate | SA 1 S offered & Ruled out of order (Justus)--(5795S01.02S) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Reported from S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee to Floor |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2014-02-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 814-Brown |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=29426043 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/pdf-bill/intro/SB814.pdf |