MO SB671 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 671-Sater
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 671-Sater
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the equine activity liability waiver to livestock activities
Title
Extends the equine activity liability waiver to livestock activities
Sponsors
Sen. David Sater [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 671-Sater |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Reported from S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee to Floor |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2014-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 671-Sater |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=28134653 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/pdf-bill/intro/SB671.pdf |