MO SB666 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SS for SCS for SB 666-Schmitt (In Fiscal Oversight)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SS for SCS for SB 666-Schmitt (In Fiscal Oversight)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates an income tax credit equal to 0.75% of the value of a taxpayer's residential real property
Title
Creates an income tax credit equal to 0.75% of the value of a taxpayer's residential real property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | S Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SS for SCS for SB 666-Schmitt (In Fiscal Oversight) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee (Fiscal Oversight) |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Hearing Scheduled But No Action Taken S Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee (Fiscal Oversight) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Perfected |
2014-03-05 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Schmitt)--(4409S.05F) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Motion to reconsider adoption of SCS - S adopted |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Motion to reconsider perfection vote - S adopted |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Perfected |
2014-02-24 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2014-02-05 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee (4409S.03C) |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2014-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 666-Schmitt |