MO SB638 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SCS for SBs 638 & 647-Romine, with HA 1 & HA 2
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SCS for SBs 638 & 647-Romine, with HA 1 & HA 2
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Raises the cap on issuance of certain benevolent tax credits
Title
Raises the cap on issuance of certain benevolent tax credits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | House | S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SCS for SBs 638 & 647-Romine, with HA 1 & HA 2 |
2014-05-16 | House | H Third Read and Passed, as amended |
2014-05-16 | House | HA 2 H offered & adopted (Fitzwater)--(4975S03.21H) |
2014-05-16 | House | HA 1 H offered & adopted (Korman)--(4975S03.19H) |
2014-05-07 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2014-05-07 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2014-05-05 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2014-05-01 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-05-01 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-30 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2014-04-30 | House | Reported Do Pass H Economic Development Committee |
2014-04-29 | House | Voted Do Pass H Economic Development Committee |
2014-04-29 | House | Hearing Conducted H Economic Development Committee |
2014-04-24 | House | Referred H Economic Development Committee |
2014-04-24 | House | H Second Read |
2014-04-23 | House | H First Read |
2014-04-23 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee (Fiscal Oversight) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Perfected |
2014-04-15 | Senate | SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2014-04-15 | Senate | SA 2 to SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2014-04-15 | Senate | SA 1 to SA 2 to SCS S offered & adopted (Schaefer)--(4975S03.03S) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | SA 2 to SCS S offered (Schaefer)--(4975S03.02S) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Nasheed)--(4975S03.01S) |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2014-02-12 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SBs 638 & 647) S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee (4975S.03C) |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2014-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 638-Romine |
2013-12-18 | Senate | Prefiled |