MO SB634 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 634-Parson, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 634-Parson, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the title insurance law with respect to the performance of escrow, settlement, or closing services by title insurers, agencies, and agents
Title
Modifies the title insurance law with respect to the performance of escrow, settlement, or closing services by title insurers, agencies, and agents
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Parson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 634-Parson, with SCS |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Reported from S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2014-03-11 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee (4746S.02C) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2014-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 634-Parson |
2013-12-17 | Senate | Prefiled |