MO SB631 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-12 - Referred to H Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-12 - Referred to H Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the law relating to the authorizing of local sales taxes and community center districts, annexation elections, absentee voting, military voting procedures, and initiative petitions
Title
Modifies the law relating to the authorizing of local sales taxes and community center districts, annexation elections, absentee voting, military voting procedures, and initiative petitions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-12 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2014-05-12 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Elections Committee |
2014-05-06 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Elections Committee |
2014-04-01 | House | Hearing Conducted H Elections Committee |
2014-03-26 | House | Referred H Elections Committee |
2014-03-20 | House | H Second Read |
2014-03-13 | House | H First Read |
2014-03-13 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor - Consent |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2014-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 631-Wallingford |
2013-12-13 | Senate | Prefiled |