MO SB617 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 617-Parson, with SCS, SS for SCS & SA 1 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 617-Parson, with SCS, SS for SCS & SA 1 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes rights of insurers to present reservation of rights to insured without breaching insurance contract, to defend against loss prior to garnishment, and to refuse to enter contracts to limit recovery
Title
Establishes rights of insurers to present reservation of rights to insured without breaching insurance contract, to defend against loss prior to garnishment, and to refuse to enter contracts to limit recovery
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Rupp [R] | Sen. Mike Parson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 617-Parson, with SCS, SS for SCS & SA 1 (pending) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Taken up for Perfection |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-04-16 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Schaaf)--(4628S03.02S) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Parson)--(4628S.03F) |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Reported from S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2014-02-18 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee (4628S.02C) |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2014-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 617-Rupp |
2013-12-09 | Senate | Prefiled |