MO SB599 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-05 - Hearing Conducted H Government Oversight and Accountability Committee
Pending: House Government Oversight and Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-05 - Hearing Conducted H Government Oversight and Accountability Committee
Pending: House Government Oversight and Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Restricts the storage and use as evidence of data collected through automated license plate reader systems by government entities
Title
Restricts the storage and use as evidence of data collected through automated license plate reader systems by government entities
Sponsors
Sen. Will Kraus [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | House | Hearing Conducted H Government Oversight and Accountability Committee |
2014-04-22 | House | Referred H Government Oversight and Accountability Committee |
2014-04-22 | House | H Second Read |
2014-04-17 | House | H First Read |
2014-04-17 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Perfected |
2014-04-15 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Kraus)--(4725S.05F) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | SA 2 to SCS S withdrawn |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-03-26 | Senate | SA 2 to SCS S offered (Holsman)--(4725S03.03S) |
2014-03-26 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Kraus)--(4725S03.02S) |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Reported from S General Laws Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2014-02-11 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee (4725S.03C) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee |
2014-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 599-Kraus |
2013-12-03 | Senate | Prefiled |