MO SB546 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progress
Action: 2014-02-18 - Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies Missouri' Health Care Freedom Act by prohibiting the state from implementing a health insurance exchange, prohibiting insurers from accepting remuneration and prescribing duties of the Attorney General for enforcement of the act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies Missouri' Health Care Freedom Act by prohibiting the state from implementing a health insurance exchange, prohibiting insurers from accepting remuneration and prescribing duties of the Attorney General for enforcement of the act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-18SenateVoted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
2014-01-28SenateHearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
2014-01-15SenateSecond Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
2014-01-08SenateS First Read--SB 546-Lamping, et al
2013-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback