MO SB538 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SS for SB 538-Keaveny (In Fiscal Oversight)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SS for SB 538-Keaveny (In Fiscal Oversight)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to state funding for education
Title
Modifies provisions relating to state funding for education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | S Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SS for SB 538-Keaveny (In Fiscal Oversight) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Taken up for Perfection |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Perfected |
2014-05-01 | Senate | SS S offered & adopted (Keaveny)--(4497S.04F) |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee to Floor |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Education Committee |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Education Committee |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2014-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 538-Keaveny and Holsman |
2013-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |