MO SB523 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-10 - Legislature voted to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-10 - Legislature voted to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits school districts from requiring a student to use an identification device that uses radio frequency identification technology to transmit certain information
Title
Prohibits school districts from requiring a student to use an identification device that uses radio frequency identification technology to transmit certain information
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Emery [R] | Sen. Ed Emery [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-10 | House | Legislature voted to override Governor's veto |
2014-09-10 | House | H adopted motion to override Governor's veto |
2014-09-10 | House | S adopted motion to override Governor's veto |
2014-07-09 | House | Vetoed by Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2014-05-30 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2014-04-28 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2014-04-28 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2014-04-17 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-17 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-14 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2014-04-14 | House | Reported Do Pass H Downsizing State Government Committee |
2014-04-10 | House | Voted Do Pass H Downsizing State Government Committee |
2014-04-03 | House | Hearing Conducted H Downsizing State Government Committee |
2014-03-26 | House | Referred H Downsizing State Government Committee |
2014-03-20 | House | H Second Read |
2014-03-13 | House | H First Read |
2014-03-13 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Perfected |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Reported from S General Laws Committee to Floor |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee |
2014-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 523-Emery |
2013-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |