MO SB518 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 518-Sater, with SCS, SA 2 & SA 1 to SA 2 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 518-Sater, with SCS, SA 2 & SA 1 to SA 2 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Extends MO HealthNet managed care statewide for only the current managed care populations
Title
Extends MO HealthNet managed care statewide for only the current managed care populations
Sponsors
Sen. David Sater [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 518-Sater, with SCS, SA 2 & SA 1 to SA 2 (pending) |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-02-05 | Senate | SA 1 to SA 2 to SCS S offered (Sater)--(4573S04.19S) |
2014-02-05 | Senate | SA 2 to SCS S offered (Schaaf)--(4573S04.05S) |
2014-02-05 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S defeated |
2014-02-05 | Senate | SA 2 to SA 1 to SCS S offered & defeated (Schaaf)--(4573S04.23S) |
2014-02-05 | Senate | SA 1 to SA 1 to SCS S offered & defeated (Schaaf)--(4573S04.22S) |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-02-05 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S offered (LeVota)--(4573S04.10S) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Reported from S Seniors, Families and Pensions Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2014-01-29 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Pensions Committee - (4573S.04C) |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Pensions Committee |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Pensions Committee |
2014-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 518-Sater |
2013-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |