MO SB514 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-16 - Bill Combined (w/SCS SB's 798 & 514)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-16 - Bill Combined (w/SCS SB's 798 & 514)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the State Board of Education, the Department of Elementary and Secondary Education, and school districts from implementing the Common Core State Standards
Title
Prohibits the State Board of Education, the Department of Elementary and Secondary Education, and school districts from implementing the Common Core State Standards
Sponsors
Sen. John Lamping [R] | Sen. Brian Nieves [R] | Sen. Ed Emery [R] | Sen. Rob Schaaf [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | Senate | Bill Combined (w/SCS SB's 798 & 514) |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2014-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 514-Lamping, et al |
2013-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=27723569 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/pdf-bill/intro/SB514.pdf |