MO SB26 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SS#2 for SCS for SBs 26, 11 & 31-Kraus, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SS#2 for SCS for SBs 26, 11 & 31-Kraus, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions of law relating to taxation
Title
Modifies provisions of law relating to taxation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | House | S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SS#2 for SCS for SBs 26, 11 & 31-Kraus, with HCS, as amended |
2013-04-24 | House | H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2013-04-24 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2013-04-24 | House | Motion to postpone discussion until review of Fiscal Note is completed H defeated |
2013-04-24 | House | HA 3 to HCS H adopted |
2013-04-24 | House | HA 1 to HA 3 to HCS H offered & Ruled out of order (Haefner)--(0363H11.01F) |
2013-04-24 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered (Burlison)--(0363H11.07H) |
2013-04-24 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hough)--(0363H11.24H) |
2013-04-24 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Kelley)--(0363H11.19H) |
2013-04-23 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2013-04-23 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2013-04-18 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2013-04-18 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-04-18 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-04-17 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2013-04-17 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Ways and Means Committee |
2013-04-16 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Ways and Means Committee |
2013-04-02 | House | Hearing Conducted H Ways and Means Committee |
2013-03-27 | House | Referred H Ways and Means Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | H Second Read |
2013-03-12 | House | H First Read |
2013-03-12 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Perfected |
2013-03-06 | Senate | SS#2 for SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2013-03-06 | Senate | SA 9 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & defeated (LeVota)--(0363S07.45S) |
2013-03-06 | Senate | SA 8 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (Kraus)--(0363S07.43S) |
2013-03-06 | Senate | SA 7 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (Sifton)--(0363S07.40S) |
2013-03-06 | Senate | SA 6 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & defeated (Nasheed)--(0363S06.15S) |
2013-03-06 | Senate | SA 5 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & defeated (Justus)--(0363S07.20S) |
2013-03-06 | Senate | SA 4 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (Dixon)--(0363S07.26S) |
2013-03-06 | Senate | SA 3 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (Romine)--(0363S07.30S) |
2013-03-06 | Senate | SA 2 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (Schmitt)--(0363S07.39S) |
2013-03-06 | Senate | SA 1 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & Ruled out of order (Holsman)--(0363S07.32S) |
2013-03-06 | Senate | SS#2 for SCS S offered (Kraus)--(0363S.07F) |
2013-03-06 | Senate | SS for SCS S withdrawn |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2013-02-27 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & defeated (LeVota)--(0363S06.05S) |
2013-02-27 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Kraus)--(0363S.06F) |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Reported from S Ways and Means Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2013-02-25 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SB's 26, 11 & 31) S Ways and Means Committee - (0363S.05C) |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2013-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 26-Kraus |
2012-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |