MO SB207 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 207-Kehoe, et al, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Allows electric corporations to recover costs for infrastructure replacement projects

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows electric corporations to recover costs for infrastructure replacement projects

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-17SenateS Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 207-Kehoe, et al, with SCS
2013-03-13SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2013-03-07SenateReported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee to Floor w/SCS
2013-02-20SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee - (0991S.03C)
2013-02-05SenateHearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
2013-01-31SenateSecond Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
2013-01-24SenateS First Read--SB 207-Kehoe, et al

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback