MO SB17 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the Advisory Council on the Education of Gifted and Talented Children and the Career and Technical Education Advisory Council

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the Advisory Council on the Education of Gifted and Talented Children and the Career and Technical Education Advisory Council

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-11SenateSigned by Governor
2013-05-30SenateDelivered to Governor
2013-05-30SenateSigned by House Speaker
2013-05-30SenateSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2013-05-30SenateReported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
2013-05-17SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2013-05-17SenateCCS H Third Read and Passed
2013-05-17SenateCCR H adopted
2013-05-16HouseCCS S Third Read and Passed (0283S.10S)
2013-05-16HouseCCR S offered & adopted (0283S10.1SR)
2013-05-15HouseH submits CCR
2013-05-09HouseH conferees appointed: Thomson, Scharnhorst, Montecillo
2013-05-09HouseS conferees appointed: Munzlinger, Lamping, Romine, Curls, Chappelle-Nadal
2013-05-09HouseH refuses to recede and grants conference
2013-05-08HouseS requests H recede or grant conference
2013-05-08HouseS refuses to concur in HCS, as amended
2013-05-07HouseH Third Read and Passed
2013-05-07HouseHCS, as amended, H adopted
2013-05-07HouseHA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Scharnhorst)--(0283L06.10H)
2013-05-07HouseLaid over (H)
2013-05-07HouseHA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Stream)--(0283L06.08H)
2013-05-07HouseHA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Neth)--(0283L06.03H)
2013-05-07HouseHA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Funderburk)--(0283L06.11H)
2013-05-07HouseHA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Shumake)--(0283L06.09H)
2013-05-07HouseHA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Thomson)--(0283L06.05H)
2013-04-23HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee
2013-04-23HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee
2013-04-16HouseReferred to H Rules Committee
2013-04-16HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Higher Education Committee
2013-04-16HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Higher Education Committee
2013-04-09HouseHearing Conducted H Higher Education Committee
2013-03-27HouseReferred H Higher Education Committee
2013-02-15HouseH Second Read
2013-02-14HouseH First Read
2013-02-14SenateS Third Read and Passed
2013-02-13SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
2013-02-13SenatePerfected
2013-02-13SenateSCS, as amended, S adopted
2013-02-13SenateSSA 1 for SA 2 to SCS S offered & adopted (Schaefer)--(0283S05.03S)
2013-02-13SenateSA 2 to SCS S offered (Sifton)--(0283S05.02S)
2013-02-13SenateSA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Kehoe)--(0283S05.01S)
2013-02-12SenateReported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor w/SCS
2013-02-11SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee - (0283S.05C)
2013-01-28SenateHearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
2013-01-10SenateSecond Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
2013-01-09SenateS First Read--SB 17-Munzlinger and Romine
2012-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback