MO SB166 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the name of the "I Have a Dream" specialty license plate to the "Dare to Dream" specialty license plate
Title
Changes the name of the "I Have a Dream" specialty license plate to the "Dare to Dream" specialty license plate
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-05-27 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed by House Speaker Pro Tem |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2015-05-27 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2015-05-15 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2015-05-15 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2015-04-23 | House | Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on State and Local Governments (Pursuant to H Rule 27.13) |
2015-04-23 | House | Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on State and Local Governments (Pursuant to H Rule 27.13) |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred H Select Committee on State and Local Governments (Pursuant to H Rule 27.13) Committee |
2015-04-15 | House | Reported Do Pass H Transportation Committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Voted Do Pass H Transportation Committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Hearing Conducted H Transportation Committee |
2015-04-02 | House | Referred H Transportation Committee |
2015-03-16 | House | H Second Read |
2015-03-12 | House | H First Read |
2015-03-12 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee to Floor - Consent |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2015-01-07 | Senate | S First Read--SB 166-Nasheed |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Prefiled |