MO SB153 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that a managed care plan's network is adequate if the health carrier is accredited by the Accreditation Association for Ambulatory Health Care
Title
Provides that a managed care plan's network is adequate if the health carrier is accredited by the Accreditation Association for Ambulatory Health Care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2015-01-07 | Senate | S First Read--SB 153-Wallingford |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=215993 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/pdf-bill/intro/SB153.pdf |