MO SB114 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - In Conference--SS for SCS for SB 114-Schmitt, with HA 1, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to intoxicating liquor

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to intoxicating liquor

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-17HouseIn Conference--SS for SCS for SB 114-Schmitt, with HA 1, as amended
2013-05-17HouseMotion to adopt CCR withdrawn
2013-05-17HousePoint of order withdrawn
2013-05-17HousePoint of order CCR exceeds differences (Schaaf) point of order taken under advisement
2013-05-17HouseCCR S offered (0175S07.1SR)
2013-05-16HouseH submits CCR
2013-05-16HouseS conferees appointed: Schmitt, Schaefer, Parson, McKenna, Holsman
2013-05-15HouseH conferees appointed: Jones-50, Richardson, Hummel
2013-05-15HouseH refuses to recede and grants conference
2013-05-15HouseS requests H recede or grant conference
2013-05-15HouseS refuses to concur in HA 1, as amended
2013-05-14HouseMotion to concur in HA 1, as amended, S withdrawn
2013-05-14HouseSubstitute Motion: Refuse to adopt HA 1, as amended & request H recede or grant conference
2013-05-14HouseMotion: S concur in HA1, as amended (Schmitt)
2013-05-08HouseH Third Read and Passed, as amended - EC adopted
2013-05-08HouseHA 1, as amended, H adopted
2013-05-08HouseHSA 1 for HA 1, as amended, H offered & defeated (Cox)--(0175S05.06F)
2013-05-08HouseHA 1 to HA 1 H offered & adopted (Haahr)--(0175S05.05H)
2013-05-08HouseHA 1 H offered (Engler)--(0175S05.11H)
2013-05-02HouseReported Do Pass H Rules Committee
2013-04-30HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules Committee
2013-04-18HouseReferred to H Rules Committee
2013-04-18HouseReported Do Pass H General Laws Committee
2013-04-16HouseVoted Do Pass H General Laws Committee
2013-04-09HouseHearing Conducted H General Laws Committee
2013-03-27HouseReferred H General Laws Committee
2013-03-08HouseH Second Read
2013-03-07HouseH First Read
2013-03-07SenateS Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
2013-03-05SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
2013-03-04SenatePerfected
2013-03-04SenateSS for SCS S offered & adopted (Schmitt)--(0175S.05F)
2013-02-28SenateReported from S General Laws Committee to Floor w/SCS
2013-02-19SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee - (0175S.04C)
2013-02-12SenateHearing Conducted S General Laws Committee
2013-01-24SenateSecond Read and Referred S General Laws Committee
2013-01-09SenateS First Read--SB 114-Schmitt
2013-01-07SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback