MO HJR20 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-06 - Action Postponed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-06 - Action Postponed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment allowing anyone elected to the General Assembly after November 1, 2016, to serve up to 12 years in any one house and up to 24 years total in the General Assembly
Title
Proposes a constitutional amendment allowing anyone elected to the General Assembly after November 1, 2016, to serve up to 12 years in any one house and up to 24 years total in the General Assembly
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2015-05-06 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2015-04-14 | House | Referred: Select Committee on General Laws(H) |
2015-04-14 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-08 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-04-01 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred: Emerging Issues(H) |
2015-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-07 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2014-12-16 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HJR20&year=2015&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills151/billpdf/intro/HJR0020I.PDF |